MA H5156 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H5133
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 249 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 249 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land to the school department in the city of Westfield
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land to the school department in the city of Westfield
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | House Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | Rep. Kelly Pease [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-31 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 249 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-10-24 | House | Enacted |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-10-24 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-10-20 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2022-08-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-31 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-31 | House | New draft of H5133 |
2022-07-31 | House | Pending new draft of H5133 |
2022-07-31 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H5133 (Replaces) 2022-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H5156
S3090 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
S3091 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Message read and placed on file
S246 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2566
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
H5069 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5133
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
S3090 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
S3091 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Message read and placed on file
S246 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2566
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
H5069 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5133
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5156 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5156.pdf |