MA H3188 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3994
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land to the Fitchburg Redevelopment Authority. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land to the Fitchburg Redevelopment Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3994 |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H3994 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4902
H4126 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2022
H4237 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4900
H4366 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - New draft substituted, see H5045
H5045 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2022
H4902 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Governor's amendment adopted
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
H2189 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2021
H3994 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4902
H4126 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2022
H4237 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4900
H4366 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - New draft substituted, see H5045
H5045 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2022
H4902 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Governor's amendment adopted
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
H2189 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3188 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3188.pdf |