CA AB1252 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 529, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 529, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 12.3 (commencing with Section 14245) to Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to public safety.
Title
Office of Gun Violence Prevention.
Sponsors
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Sen. Catherine Blakespear [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] |
Asm. Rick Zbur [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1252 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1252 Wicks et al. By Blakespear (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Assembly - AB 1252 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1252 Wicks et al. By Blakespear (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Assembly - AB 1252 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 529, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 10.). |
2024-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2024-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.). |
2024-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9.) |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 15). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 6. Page 3932.) |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 14245 | New Code | See Bill Text |