MA S3066 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Nantucket to convey for roadway and any other purposes certain parcels of land within the roadway known as Ames Avenue, and shown as lots 35-38 (inclusive) in block 31 on land court plan no. 2408-m filed with the Nantucket registry district of the land court situated in the town of Nantucket held for conservation or recreational purposes to be conveyed for roadway and/or any purposes. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local approval received]
Title
Authorizing the town of Nantucket to convey for roadway and any other purposes certain parcels of land within the roadway known as Ames Avenue, and shown as lots 35-38 (inclusive) in block 31 on land court plan no. 2408-m filed with the Nantucket registry district of the land court situated in the town of Nantucket held for conservation or recreational purposes to be conveyed for roadway and/or any purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-30 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S3081 |
2022-07-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2022 from 05:30 PM-03:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-07-28 | House | House concurred |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S154 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1357 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2022
S574 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied H929
S148 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S3078 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - New draft (Collins) substituted, see S3088
S3073 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 182 of the Acts of 2022
H5142 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2022
S3081 (Replaced by) 2022-07-31 - New draft (Cyr) substituted, see S3090
S3091 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Message read and placed on file
S3083 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft (Cyr) substituted, see S3091
S3090 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
S3067 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3083
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1357 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2022
S574 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied H929
S148 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S3078 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - New draft (Collins) substituted, see S3088
S3073 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 182 of the Acts of 2022
H5142 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2022
S3081 (Replaced by) 2022-07-31 - New draft (Cyr) substituted, see S3090
S3091 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Message read and placed on file
S3083 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft (Cyr) substituted, see S3091
S3090 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
S3067 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3083
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3066 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3066.pdf |