MA S148 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-15 - Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Community Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize municipalities to expend certain funds for the acquisition of land to be used for rail trails. Community Development and Small Businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing municipalities to expend certain funds for the acquisition of land to be used for rail trails

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-15JointHearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses

Same As/Similar To

H286 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3768 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3996
H3751 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3972 (Similar To) 2021-09-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2021
H3996 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
S2503 (Similar To) 2021-08-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4058 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4098 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4104 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3346 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1357 (Similar To) 2021-08-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3100 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1359 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1060 (Similar To) 2021-07-27 - Hearing scheduled for 08/03/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S574 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - House concurred
S1323 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S154 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2174 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback