CA SB989 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 129 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Section 27491 of the Government Code, to amend Section 13519 of, and to add Section 679.07 to, the Penal Code, relating to domestic violence.
Title
Domestic violence: deaths.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB S. and JUD. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 129 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 27491 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13519 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 679.07 | New Code | See Bill Text |