MA H3768 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3996
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city of Cambridge be authorized to utilize certain land for the installation of subsurface geothermal wells. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the city of Cambridge to utilize certain land used for park, playground or recreation uses for general municipal purposes, including but not limited to school purposes, and for installation of subsurface geothermal wells in certain land used for park, playground or recreation uses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-26HouseAmended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3996
2021-07-26HouseRead third (title changed)
2021-07-19HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-07-19HouseRules suspended
2021-07-19HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-07-15HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-06-15JointHearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-05-13SenateSenate concurred
2021-05-10HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H3858 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1526 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2725 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3939 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Senate concurred
H3945 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3983 (Similar To) 2021-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3996 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 126 )
H4166 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback