MA H3858 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Hearing: Jan 19 @ 3:00 pm in Virtual Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city of Cambridge be authorized to provide for electric vehicle charging stations in said city. Transportation. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for electric vehicle charging stations in the city of Cambridge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11JointHearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-10SenateSenate concurred
2021-06-07HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3768 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3996
H1526 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2725 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3939 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Senate concurred
H3945 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3983 (Similar To) 2021-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3996 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - House concurred in the Senate amendment
H4166 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback