MA H2725 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5319
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5319
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5319
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include certain employees of the Commonwealth and certain Cambridge Health Alliance/Cambridge Hospital employees in Group 2 of the contributory retirement system for public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to Group 2 retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5319 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 22, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday March 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2699 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3768 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3996
H3858 (Similar To) 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 329 of the Acts of 2022
H2798 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3939 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3983 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3996 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2022
H1526 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4502
S1738 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1687 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H5319 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2797 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2779 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3768 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3996
H3858 (Similar To) 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 329 of the Acts of 2022
H2798 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3939 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3983 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3996 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2022
H1526 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4502
S1738 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1687 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H5319 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2797 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2779 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2725 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2725.pdf |