MA H3983 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city of Cambridge be authorized to offer early voting in municipal elections. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the city of Cambridge to offer early voting in municipal elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-10JointHearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-07-22SenateSenate concurred
2021-07-21HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H3939 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Senate concurred
H3768 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3996
H3858 (Similar To) 2021-06-10 - Senate concurred
H3996 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
S2530 (Similar To) 2021-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S477 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S448 (Similar To) 2021-06-19 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H825 (Similar To) 2021-06-19 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S457 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H838 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1693 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S485 (Similar To) 2021-06-19 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback