US HB5527 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 1078 of the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018 to increase the effectiveness of the Technology Modernization Fund, and for other purposes.
Title
Modernizing Government Technology Reform Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-05-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. |
2024-05-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5527. |
2024-05-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-05-21 | House | Ms. Mace moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2024-02-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 326. |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Accountability. H. Rept. 118-397. |
2023-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 43 - 0. |
2023-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-09-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2023-09-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5527 (Related) 2024-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.