US HB8791 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the settlement of the water rights claims of the Fort Belknap Indian Community, and for other purposes.
Title
Fort Belknap Indian Community Water Rights Settlement Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2024-06-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1987 (Related) 2024-06-21 - Held at the desk.
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/8791/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr8791/BILLS-118hr8791ih.pdf |