LA HB609 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Room A-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Room A-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the appraisal process and employment of umpires
Title
Provides for the appraisal process and employment of umpires
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 609 FINAL PASSAGE (#259) (Y: 79 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |