CA SB1454 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6981, 7511.5, 7512.3, 7512.14, 7512.15, 7520.3, 7525.1, 7529, 7533.5, 7538, 7538.5, 7539, 7573.5, 7574.01, 7574.14, 7576, 7580.3, 7582.7, 7583.47, 7585.3, 7585.11, 7587.11, 7588.8, 7593.1, 7593.5, 7599.345, and 7599.80 of, and to add Section 7580.15 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Bureau of Security and Investigative Services: sunset: limited liability companies: federally recognized tribes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3606.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |