MA H825 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-19 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing a local option for ranked choice voting in municipal elections. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a local option for ranked choice voting in municipal elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-19JointHearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S485 (Similar To) 2021-06-19 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S448 (Similar To) 2021-06-19 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3950 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Senate concurred
H3983 (Similar To) 2021-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2530 (Similar To) 2021-09-16 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback