US SB1111 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 118-182.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 118-182.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to enhance United States civil nuclear leadership, support the licensing of advanced nuclear technologies, strengthen the domestic nuclear energy fuel cycle and supply chain, and improve the regulation of nuclear energy, and for other purposes.
Title
ADVANCE Act of 2023 Accelerating Deployment of Versatile, Advanced Nuclear for Clean Energy Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Sen. Pete Ricketts [R-NE] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Senate | By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 118-182. |
2023-07-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 118. |
2023-07-10 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Carper with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
SB870 (Related) 2024-07-09 - Became Public Law No: 118-67.