CA AB2908 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 600, 5510, 7510, 9411, and 12460 of the Corporations Code, relating to corporations.
Title
Shareholders’ meetings: remote communication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2908 Chen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - AB 2908 Chen Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - AB 2908 Chen Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-07-18 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2024-07-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4931.). |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2024-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4794.) |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 1). |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 12460 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 7510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 9411 | Amended Code | Citation Text |