US HB6829 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 118-176.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Public Health Service Act to authorize and support the creation and dissemination of cardiomyopathy education, awareness, and risk assessment materials and resources to identify more at-risk families, to authorize research and surveillance activities relating to cardiomyopathy, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEARTS Act of 2024 Cardiomyopathy Health Education, Awareness, and Research, and AED Training in the Schools Act of 2024

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-23HouseBecame Public Law No: 118-176.
2024-12-23HouseSigned by President.
2024-12-17HousePresented to President.
2024-12-11SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2024-12-10SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6934-6935)
2024-12-10SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2024-09-24SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
2024-09-23HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2024-09-23HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5573-5574)
2024-09-23HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6829.
2024-09-23HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5573-5575)
2024-09-23HouseMr. Bucshon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2024-05-22HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 432.
2024-05-22HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-520.
2024-03-20HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 42 - 0.
2024-03-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2024-03-12HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 0.
2024-03-12HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-12-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2023-12-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2023-12-14HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback