LA SB200 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for out-of-state health insurance coverage when the governor declares a state of emergency. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides for out-of-state health insurance coverage when the governor declares a state of emergency. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 200 FINAL PASSAGE (#366) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |