MA H3996 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Ms. Garlick of Needham, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 3768) [Local Approval Received]. July 26, 2021.
Title
Authorizing the city of Cambridge to use certain land for general municipal purposes and the installation of subsurface geothermal wells
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #121 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #121 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2022-01-19 | House | Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 126 ) |
2021-12-20 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2021-11-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Amended (DiDomenico) by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in the place thereof the text of S2586 |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Read third |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-07-26 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2021-07-26 | House | Substituted for H3768 |
Same As/Similar To
H3939 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3768 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3996
H3983 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3858 (Similar To) 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 329 of the Acts of 2022
H1526 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4502
H2725 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5319
H4166 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H3945 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1693 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H3768 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3996
H3983 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3858 (Similar To) 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 329 of the Acts of 2022
H1526 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4502
H2725 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5319
H4166 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H3945 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1693 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679