CA AB1359 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 3715.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: geothermal exploratory projects: lead agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1359 Schiavo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1359 Schiavo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 1905.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3715.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |