US HB802 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-07-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 514.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-07-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 514.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the CARES Act to remove a requirement on lessors to provide notice to vacate, and for other purposes.
Title
Respect State Housing Laws Act
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Mike Flood [R-NE] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Eric Burlison [R-MO] |
Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Monica De La Cruz [R-TX] | Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
Rep. Chuck Edwards [R-NC] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Lori Chavez-DeRemer [R-OR] | Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL] |
Rep. Rudolph Yakym III [R-IN] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Andrew Clyde [R-GA] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] |
Rep. Nathaniel Moran [R-TX] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Morgan Luttrell [R-TX] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] |
Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Elijah Crane [R-AZ] | Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] | Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 514. |
2024-07-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 118-616. |
2024-04-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 21. |
2024-04-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2023-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3755 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.