PA SB298 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in equipment standards, further providing for unlawful activities; in other required equipment, further providing for restraint systems; and abrogating regulations.
Title
In equipment standards, further providing for unlawful activities; in other required equipment, further providing for restraint systems; and abrogating regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-29 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01485 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 298 PN 382, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00093 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 298 PN 382, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00093 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-06-29 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2023-03-07 | House | In the House |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-03-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |