MA H4166 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4933
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the city of Cambridge to provide police, fire, emergency and other municipal services to certain properties in the city of Somerville and the city of Boston. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Cambridge to provide police, fire, emergency and other municipal services to certain properties in the city of Somerville and the city of Boston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4933 |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-09-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3221 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5334
H847 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3395 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1693 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2942 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
S1774 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2115 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1596 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2022
H4933 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1526 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4502
H2725 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5319
H3939 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3768 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3996
H3221 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5334
H847 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3395 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1693 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2942 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
S1774 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2115 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1596 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2022
H4933 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1526 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4502
H2725 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5319
H3939 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3768 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3996
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4166 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4166.pdf |