MA H3100 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to include insurance under Chapter 30B, the Uniform Procurement Act. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring municipalities to place insurance out to bid

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30JointHearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S2472 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Reported in part, S2475
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S787 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1221 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S725 (Similar To) 2021-08-24 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S241 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S1331 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1359 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1191 (Similar To) 2021-09-14 - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2487 (Similar To) 2021-11-11 - Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S661 (Similar To) 2021-08-24 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S199 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2587 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S710 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1802 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S709 (Similar To) 2021-08-24 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S634 (Similar To) 2021-10-26 - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S671 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1202 (Similar To) 2021-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S658 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback