IL SB3751 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Equitable Health Outcomes Act. Provides that an entity required to collect health data and report it to the Department of Public Health shall include, in the patient data collected, the following items: (i) race; (ii) ethnicity; (iii) sexual orientation; (iv) gender identity; (v) language; and (vi) such other demographic information as the Department requires by rule. Creates the Health Outcomes Review Board. Provides that the Board shall be tasked with annually reviewing and reporting data on health outcomes, including illnesses, treatments, and causes of death in Illinois and facilitating adoption of solutions. Provides that the Board shall be composed of a minimum of 21 and a maximum of 25 members appointed by the Director of Public Health or the Director's designee. Provides that members shall serve 3-year terms. Provides for qualifications and requirements of Board members. Provides that the first Board meeting shall be held as soon as practicable following the appointment of a majority of members. Provides that the Board shall meet no less than 4 times per calendar year. Provides that each Board member shall sign a confidentiality agreement regarding personally identifiable information that the Department deems necessary to the Board's objectives or that is disclosed to the Board inadvertently. Provides that a Board member who knowingly violates the confidentiality agreement commits a misdemeanor. Provides for immunity from subpoenas regarding the information presented in or opinions formed as a result of a meeting or communication of the Board. Provides that notes, statements, medical records, reports, communications, and memoranda that contain, or may contain, patient information are not subject to subpoena, discovery, or introduction into evidence in any civil, criminal, or administrative proceeding. Describes the Board's duties. Provides requirements for reports prepared by the Board. Provides for the adoption of rules to implement the Act. Makes other changes.
Title
EQUITABLE HEALTH OUTCOMES ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 006-002-000 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |