CA AB2104 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 3.3 (commencing with Section 78045) of Chapter 1 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Community colleges: Baccalaureate Degree in Nursing Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78045 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |