CA SB758 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 543, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 543, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 27520 and 27590 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB758 Umberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Assembly - SB 758 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Grayson (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB758 Umberg (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Assembly - SB 758 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Grayson (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB758 Umberg (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 543, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-04 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 5559.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6544.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 1260.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1182.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 660.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 27520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27590 | Amended Code | Citation Text |