RI H7282 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS -- POWERS AND OPERATIONS - Amends outdated provisions of the banking statutes and the home loan protection act, adds consumer protections, including minimum capital requirements and limits on investments, for currency transmitters, including crypto currency.
Title
Amends outdated provisions of the banking statutes and the home loan protection act, adds consumer protections, including minimum capital requirements and limits on investments, for currency transmitters, including crypto currency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Alex Finkelman [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2024) |
2024-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7282.pdf |