MA S428 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2650

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to a special community care retirement communities commission. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve relative to a special community care retirement communities commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-03SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2650
2021-06-08JointHearing scheduled for 06/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H1271 (Similar To) 2021-10-01 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2640 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2576 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1769 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
H2611 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2553 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1696 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2682
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S82 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4313 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2650 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback