MA S16 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Eldridge, a petition of James B. Eldridge for a legislative amendment to the Constitution to establish an independent redistricting commission. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution establishing an independent redistricting commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HousePlaced on file, in concurrence
2021-04-29SenateProposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
2021-02-22HouseHouse concurred
2021-02-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
H4313 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Enacted and laid before the Governor

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback