MA S145 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a commission to study childhood hunger in Norfolk County as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Establishing a commission to study childhood hunger in Norfolk County as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Timilty [D] | Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Rep. David Linsky [D] |
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2021-09-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S573 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4603
S2076 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H2583 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2584 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H2587 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2588 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S1289 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1290 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5229
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2638 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S60 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2688
S573 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4603
S2076 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H2583 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2584 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H2587 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2588 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S1289 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1290 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5229
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2638 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S60 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2688
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S145 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S145.pdf |