MA H2583 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to public hearings of the Group Insurance Commission. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to public hearings of the Group Insurance Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03JointHearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-03JointHearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-03JointHearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-02JointHearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S640 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1760 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1713 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1659 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S666 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S667 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S694 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Senate concurred
S633 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback