MA S365 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2748

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to anti-racism, equity and justice in education. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to anti-racism, equity and justice in education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-10SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2748
2021-09-03JointHearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H584 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
H1271 (Similar To) 2021-10-01 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S573 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4603
S2076 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H2583 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2584 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H2587 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2588 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S1289 (Similar To) 2021-09-29 - Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S82 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4313 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2748 (Replaced by) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback