MA S258 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Economic Development and Emerging Technologies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to improve the economy of the commonwealth. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To improve the economy of the commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-08JointHearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

H1271 (Similar To) 2021-10-01 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S573 (Similar To) 2021-12-07 - Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2076 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S428 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H2583 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2584 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1932 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H2587 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2588 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1229 (Similar To) 2021-08-31 - Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1612 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S994 (Similar To) 2021-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S82 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S295 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback