MA S1932 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2743
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to make certain changes in the administrative tax laws of the Commonwealth. Revenue.
Title
Improving the tax administrative laws of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2743 |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2499 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
S2524 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - New draft (Jehlen) substituted, see S3129
S312 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S258 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2710
S1813 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2743 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1911 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H2881 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S2524 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - New draft (Jehlen) substituted, see S3129
S312 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S258 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2710
S1813 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2743 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1911 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H2881 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1932 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1932.pdf |