MA H822 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5026
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing voter participation in primary elections. Election Laws.
Title
Increasing voter participation in primary elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5026 |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H822 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H822.pdf |