MA S895 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5276
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to update Chapter 40B to support the creation of affordable housing while strengthening local oversight. Housing.
Title
To update Chapter 40B to support the creation of affordable housing while strengthening local oversight
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5276 |
2021-11-01 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H1399 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1392 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1390 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1394 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H1399 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1392 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1390 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1394 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S895 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S895.pdf |