MA S868 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5351
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to empower cities and towns to impose a fee on certain real estate transactions to support affordable housing. Housing.
Title
Empowering cities and towns to impose a fee on certain real estate transactions to support affordable housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5351 |
2022-06-21 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3454 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
H4060 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
S2400 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
S1614 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1733 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2771
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
H5351 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2867 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1377 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3454 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
H4060 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
S2400 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
S1614 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1733 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2771
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
H5351 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2867 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1377 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S868 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S868.pdf |