MA H70 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2348
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to promoting equity and excellence in education (House, No. 70). January 24, 2019.
Title
To promote equity and excellence in education
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2348 |
2019-03-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S16 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - No further action taken
H8 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H86 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - Amendment agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #73 and House Roll Call 77
H473 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H476 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H510 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H558 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H436 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H1827 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S238 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1859 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S218 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2886
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S760 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
H3911 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4041 (Similar To) 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2020
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4099 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2019
H4177 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4275 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H8 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H86 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - Amendment agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #73 and House Roll Call 77
H473 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H476 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H510 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H558 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H436 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H1827 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S238 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1859 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S218 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2886
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S760 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
H3911 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4041 (Similar To) 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2020
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4099 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2019
H4177 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4275 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H70 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H70.pdf |