US HB5985 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-11)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 517 Seagaze Drive in Oceanside, California, as the "Charlesetta Reece Allen Post Office Building".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 517 Seagaze Drive in Oceanside, California, as the "Charlesetta Reece Allen Post Office Building".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-04SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2024-06-03HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2024-06-03HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
2024-06-03HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5985.
2024-06-03HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
2024-06-03HouseMr. Grothman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2024-05-15HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2024-05-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-10-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
2023-10-18HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback