MA H476 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to special education funding. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to special education funding

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12JointHearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H487 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1214 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H512 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H376 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:30 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H456 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1827 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1992 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S559 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S741 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H254 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1143 (Similar To) 2019-07-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in B-1
S252 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S501 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H3911 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback