MA H558 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5159

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the licensure and regulation of au pair and nanny agencies by the Department of Early Education and Care. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the licensure and regulation of au pair and nanny agencies by the Department of Early Education and Care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-03HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5159
2019-07-01JointHearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-06-21JointHearing scheduled for 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H520 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4291
S345 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S270 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied S342
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback