MA S759 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect public higher education student information. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting public higher education student information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H1987 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3439 (Similar To) 2019-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S889 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S854 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1048 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1108 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1798 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback