MA S2348 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S236
Note: Legislation replaced by S2350

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislation to establish parent engagement and supports grants within the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education; of Aaron Vega, Mary S. Keefe and others relative to funding for public schools and the foundation budget review commission; of John H. Rogers and Jason M. Lewis relative to the targeted local contribution of the foundation budget under the chapter 70 funding formula, so called; and (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Josh S. Cutler relative to the minimum amount of school aid available to municipalities,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2348).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to educational opportunity for students

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-03SenateNew draft substituted, see S2350
2019-10-03SenateRead second
2019-09-24SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2350
2019-09-23SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, October 3, 2019
2019-09-23SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2019-09-19SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-09-19SenateNew draft of S236, S238, S242, S243, S248, S251, S252, S273, S274, S282, S292, S308, S310, S316, S334, S335, S341, S2185, S2266, H41, H70, H409, H420, H423, H436, H449, H451, H466, H476, H485, H486, H488, H494, H497, H500, H501, H502, H510, H512, H513, H535, H562, H563, H576, H577, H578, H579, H580, H586, H3759 and H3944
2019-09-19SenateReported from the committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S236 (Replaces) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S308 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H547 (Similar To) 2019-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2350 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - Amendment #58 (Moore) rejected
H1839 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
H1202 (Similar To) 2020-03-23 - Senate concurred
H3613 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback