MA S238 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2348

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide rightful opportunities and meaningful investment for successful and equitable education. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing rightful opportunities and meaningful investment for successful and equitable education

Sponsors

Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Sen. Adam Hinds [D]Sen. Mark Montigny [D]
Sen. Edward Kennedy [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]
Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]
Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]
Sen. Barry Finegold [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]
Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Sen. Dean Tran [R]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]
Sen. Michael Rush [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]
Sen. James Welch [D]Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Sen. Anne Gobi [D]
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]
Sen. Eric Lesser [D]Sen. John Keenan [D]Sen. Donald Humason [R]Sen. Michael Moore [D]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2348
2019-03-08JointHearing scheduled for 03/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H485 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H586 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H2487 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback