MA H586 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 94-8)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to funding for public schools and the foundation budget review commission. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing rightful opportunities and meaningful investment for successful and equitable education

Sponsors

Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]
Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]
Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]
Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Sen. John Keenan [D]
Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Sen. Eric Lesser [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Leonard Mirra [R]Rep. Rady Mom [D]
Sen. Mark Montigny [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R]
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]
Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Theodore Speliotis [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Sen. Dean Tran [R]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]
Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]
Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08JointHearing scheduled for 03/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H1827 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H476 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H510 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H558 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H515 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S324 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S238 (Similar To) 2019-03-08 - Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S731 (Similar To) 2019-04-08 - House concurred
S762 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1859 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S218 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1724 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S759 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S760 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - House concurred
S761 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback