MA H86 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 105-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Amendment agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #73 and House Roll Call 77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. O'Day of West Boylston, a petition of James J. O'Day and others for a legislative amendment to the Constitution to provide resources for education and transportation through an additional tax on incomes in excess of one million dollars. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution to provide resources for education and transportation through an additional tax on incomes in excess of one million dollars

Sponsors

Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. David Biele [D]
Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]
Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]
Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Sen. John Keenan [D]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]
Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Michael Moran [D]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]
Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]
Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]
Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House On Ordering to a third reading Yea and Nay No. 56 (Y: 121 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Question on ordering the proposal to a third reading Roll Call #25 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAmendment agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #73 and House Roll Call 77
2019-06-12SenateAmendment #14 (Tarr) rejected
2019-06-12SenateAmendment #13 (Tarr) rejected
2019-06-12SenateAmendment #13.1 (Humason) rejected
2019-06-12SenateAmendment #11 (Tarr) rejected - see Senate Roll Call #72 and House Roll Call 76
2019-06-12SenateAmendment #10 (Tarr) rejected
2019-06-12SenateAmendment #10.1 (deMacedo) rejected
2019-06-12SenateAmendment #9 (Tarr) rejected
2019-06-12SenateAmendment #8 (Hunt) rejected - see Senate Roll Call #71 and House Roll Call 75
2019-06-12SenateAmendment #6 (Hunt) rejected - see Senate Roll Call #70 and House Roll Call 74
2019-06-12SenateAmendment #4 (Tarr) rejected - see Senate Roll Call #69 and House Roll Call 73
2019-06-12SenateAmendment #4.1 (Fattman) rejected
2019-06-12SenateAmendment #3 (O'Connor) rejected - see Senate Roll Call #68 and House Roll Call 72
2019-06-12SenateAmendment #1 (Jones) rejected - see Senate Roll Call #67 and House Roll Call 71
2019-06-12JointRead third
2019-05-08SenateOrdered to a third reading -- see Senate Roll Call #25 and House Roll Call 56
2019-05-08JointRead twice in succession
2019-05-06HouseCalled for consideration in the joint session
2019-04-25HousePlaced on file
2019-04-25SenateProposal for Constitutional Amendment reported favorably by committee and placed on file
2019-03-21JointHearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H82 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
H79 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
H85 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
H84 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
H83 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, November 13, 2019
H2397 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2456 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2541 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1640 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H2450 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1615 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S14 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
S1772 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1777 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2211 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback