MA S14 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the subject matter of initiative petitions. The Judiciary.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution relative to the subject matter of initiative petitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file |
2019-03-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S14 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S14.pdf |