MA H2456 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1628
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the establishment of first-time homebuyer savings accounts and providing for an income tax deduction for certain amounts contributed to such accounts. Revenue.
Title
Encouraging home ownership by establishing a first time home buyers savings account
Sponsors
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Rep. Russell Holmes [D] |
Rep. Randy Hunt [R] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-02-27 | House | Accompanied by S1628 |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2491 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2575 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2465 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2568 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1615 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S819 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H2537 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1628 (Replaces) 2020-02-28 - Accompanied H2456
H2575 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2465 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2568 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1615 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S819 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H2537 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1628 (Replaces) 2020-02-28 - Accompanied H2456
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2456 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2456.pdf |